Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/13/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 02/13/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/25/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/02/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 09/15/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/15/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/25/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/29/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 10/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/26/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/22/2010