Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 06/24/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/29/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/20/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/20/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2010