Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-361.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/16/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10365)
12/16/2010 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/28/2010 H7030)
06/25/2010 Introduced in House