Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/30/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/01/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/01/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/13/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/15/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/19/2010