There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II

Short Titles as Introduced

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the funding and expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, to amend title 49, United States Code, to extend authorizations for the airport improvement program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (6)

Date
07/02/2010Became Public Law No: 111-197. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2010Signed by President.
07/01/2010Presented to President.
06/30/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5716)
06/29/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4931-4932)
06/28/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
07/02/2010Became Public Law No: 111-197. (TXT | PDF)
07/02/2010Signed by President.
07/01/2010HousePresented to President.
06/30/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/30/2010SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5716)
06/29/2010HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
06/29/2010SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
06/29/2010-1:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/29/2010-1:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4931-4932)
06/29/2010-1:48pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5611.
06/29/2010-1:48pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4931-4934)
06/29/2010-1:48pmHouseMr. Lewis (GA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/28/2010HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
06/28/2010HouseReferred to House Transportation and Infrastructure
06/28/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/28/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/28/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure06/28/2010 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Aviation06/29/2010 Referred to
House Ways and Means06/28/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.5611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-197 (07/02/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Airport and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through August 1, 2010: (1) increased excise taxes on aviation fuels and the excise tax on air transportation of persons and property; and (2) the expenditure authority for the Airport and Airway Trust Fund.

Increases the authorization of appropriations for FY2010 for airport planning and development and noise compatibility planning projects. Extends through August 1, 2010, the authority of the Secretary of Transportation to make airport improvement project (AIP) grants.

Extends through August 1, 2010: (1) the pilot program for passenger facility fee authorizations at non-hub airports; and (2) disclosure requirements for large and medium hub airports applying for AIP grants.

Directs the Secretary of Transportation to extend through August 1, 2010, the termination date of insurance coverage for domestic or foreign-flag aircraft. Grants the Secretary discretionary authority to further extend such coverage through October 31, 2010.

Extends through August 1, 2010: (1) grant eligibility for airports located in the Marshall Islands, Micronesia, and Palau; (2) grants to state and local governments for land use compatibility projects under the AIP; and (3) authority for approving an application of the Metropolitan Washington Airports Authority for an airport development project grant or for permission to impose a passenger facility fee.

Amends the Vision 100--Century of Aviation Reauthorization Act to extend through August 1, 2010: (1) the temporary increase to 95% of the federal government's share of certain AIP project costs; and (2) funding for airport development at Midway Island Airport.

Extends through August 1, 2010, and increases for the period beginning on October 1, 2009, the authorization of appropriations for: (1) Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) operations; (2) air navigation facilities and equipment; and (3) civil aviation research and development.