Text: H.R.5611 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-197 (07/02/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 197]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 1353]]

Public Law 111-197
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
  To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to extend the funding and 
  expenditure authority of the Airport and Airway Trust Fund, to amend 
 title 49, United States Code, to extend authorizations for the airport 
      improvement program, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: July 2, 
                         2010 -  [H.R. 5611]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: Airport 
and Airway Extension Act of 2010, Part II. 26 USC 1 note.>> assembled,
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Airport and Airway Extension Act of 
2010, Part II''.
SEC. 2. EXTENSION OF TAXES FUNDING AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND.

    (a) Fuel Taxes.--Subparagraph (B) of section 4081(d)(2) of the 
Internal Revenue Code of 1986 <<NOTE: 26 USC 4081.>>  is amended by 
striking ``July 3, 2010'' and inserting ``August 1, 2010''.

    (b) Ticket Taxes.--
            (1) Persons.--Clause (ii) of section 4261(j)(1)(A) of the 
        Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking ``July 3, 
        2010'' and inserting ``August 1, 2010''.
            (2) Property.--Clause (ii) of section 4271(d)(1)(A) of such 
        Code is amended by striking ``July 3, 2010'' and inserting 
        ``August 1, 2010''.

    (c) <<NOTE: 26 USC 4081 note.>>  Effective Date.--The amendments 
made by this section shall take effect on July 4, 2010.
SEC. 3. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT AND AIRWAY TRUST FUND EXPENDITURE 
                    AUTHORITY.

    (a) In General.--Paragraph (1) of section 9502(d) of the Internal 
Revenue Code of 1986 is amended--
            (1) by striking ``July 4, 2010'' and inserting ``August 2, 
        2010''; and
            (2) by inserting ``or the Airport and Airway Extension Act 
        of 2010, Part II'' before the semicolon at the end of 
        subparagraph (A).

    (b) Conforming Amendment.--Paragraph (2) of section 9502(e) of such 
Code is amended by striking ``July 4, 2010'' and inserting ``August 2, 
2010''.
    (c) <<NOTE: 26 USC 9502 note.>>  Effective Date.--The amendments 
made by this section shall take effect on July 4, 2010.
SEC. 4. EXTENSION OF AIRPORT IMPROVEMENT PROGRAM.

    (a) Authorization of Appropriations.--
            (1) In general.--Section 48103(7) of title 49, United States 
        Code, is amended to read as follows:

[[Page 124 STAT. 1354]]

            ``(7) $3,515,000,000 for fiscal year 2010.''.
            (2) Availability of amounts.--Sums made available pursuant 
        to the amendment made by paragraph (1) shall remain available 
        until expended.

    (b) Project Grant Authority.--Section 47104(c) of such title is 
amended by striking ``July 3, 2010,'' and inserting ``August 1, 2010,''.
SEC. 5. EXTENSION OF EXPIRING AUTHORITIES.

    (a) Section 40117(l)(7) of title 49, United States Code, is amended 
by striking ``July 4, 2010.'' and inserting ``August 2, 2010.''.
    (b) Section 44302(f)(1) of such title is amended--
            (1) by striking ``July 3, 2010,'' and inserting ``August 1, 
        2010,''; and
            (2) by striking ``September 30, 2010,'' and inserting 
        ``October 31, 2010,''.

    (c) Section 44303(b) of such title is amended by striking 
``September 30, 2010,'' and inserting ``October 31, 2010,''.
    (d) Section 47107(s)(3) of such title is amended by striking ``July 
4, 2010.'' and inserting ``August 2, 2010.''.
    (e) Section 47115(j) of such title is amended by striking ``July 4, 
2010,'' and inserting ``August 2, 2010,''.
    (f) Section 47141(f) of such title is amended by striking ``July 3, 
2010.'' and inserting ``August 1, 2010.''.
    (g) Section 49108 of such title is amended by striking ``July 3, 
2010,'' and inserting ``August 1, 2010,''.
    (h) Section 161 of the Vision 100--Century of Aviation 
Reauthorization Act (49 U.S.C. 47109 note) is amended by striking ``July 
4, 2010,'' and inserting ``August 2, 2010,''.
    (i) Section 186(d) of such Act (117 Stat. 2518) is amended by 
striking ``July 4, 2010,'' and inserting ``August 2, 2010,''.
    (j) <<NOTE: Effective date. 49 USC 40117 note.>>  The amendments 
made by this section shall take effect on July 4, 2010.
SEC. 6. FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION OPERATIONS.

    Section 106(k)(1)(F) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
                    ``(F) <<NOTE: Time period.>>  $7,813,037,096 for the 
                period beginning on October 1, 2009, and ending on 
                August 1, 2010.''.
SEC. 7. AIR NAVIGATION FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT.

    Section 48101(a)(6) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(6) <<NOTE: Time period.>>  $2,453,539,493 for the period 
        beginning on October 1, 2009, and ending on August 1, 2010.''.

[[Page 124 STAT. 1355]]

SEC. 8. RESEARCH, ENGINEERING, AND DEVELOPMENT.

    Section 48102(a)(14) of title 49, United States Code, is amended to 
read as follows:
            ``(14) <<NOTE: Time period.>>  $159,184,932 for the period 
        beginning on October 1, 2009, and ending on August 1, 2010.''.

    Approved July 2, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5611:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            June 29, considered and passed House.
            June 30, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>