Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 06/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 06/28/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/21/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 08/09/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 08/09/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010