Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 06/28/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 06/28/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/30/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/01/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/26/2010