Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/21/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/24/2009