Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/15/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/19/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/10/2010