Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 06/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/16/2010