Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/13/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/17/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 03/31/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/31/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 04/01/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/13/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 05/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/16/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/16/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/01/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/22/2010