Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/30/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 06/30/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/28/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/10/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 08/10/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/22/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 12/01/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/02/2010