Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 06/30/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/01/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/29/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/29/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/28/2010