Text: H.R.5647 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (06/30/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5647

To provide a temporary extension of unemployment insurance, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
June 30, 2010

Mr. Heller introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Appropriations, Education and Labor, the Budget, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


A BILL

To provide a temporary extension of unemployment insurance, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Responsible COBRA, Unemployment, and Poverty Extension Act”.

SEC. 2. Extension of unemployment insurance provisions.

(a) In general.—(1) Section 4007 of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(A) by striking “June 2, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2010”;

(B) in the heading for subsection (b)(2), by striking “june 2, 2010” and inserting “september 30, 2010”; and

(C) in subsection (b)(3), by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “March 1, 2011”.

(2) Section 2005 of the Assistance for Unemployed Workers and Struggling Families Act, as contained in Public Law 111–5 (26 U.S.C. 3304 note; 123 Stat. 444), is amended—

(A) by striking “June 2, 2010” each place it appears and inserting “September 30, 2010”; and

(B) in subsection (c), by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “March 1, 2011”.

(3) Section 5 of the Unemployment Compensation Extension Act of 2008 (Public Law 110–449; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended by striking “November 6, 2010” and inserting “March 1, 2011”.

(b) Funding.—Section 4004(e)(1) of the Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2008 (Public Law 110–252; 26 U.S.C. 3304 note) is amended—

(1) in subparagraph (D), by striking “and” at the end; and

(2) by inserting after subparagraph (E) the following:

“(F) the amendments made by section 2(a)(1) of the Responsible COBRA, Unemployment, and Poverty Extension Act; and”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the enactment of the Continuing Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–157).

SEC. 3. Extension and improvement of premium assistance for cobra benefits.

(a) Extension of eligibility period.—Subsection (a)(3)(A) of section 3001 of division B of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5), as amended by section 3(a) of the Temporary Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–144) and section 3(a) of the Continuing Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–157), is amended by striking “May 31, 2010” and inserting “September 30, 2010”.

(b) Rules relating to 2010 extension.—Subsection (a) of section 3001 of division B of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5), as amended by section 3(b) of the Continuing Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–157), is amended by adding at the end the following:

“(19) ADDITIONAL RULES RELATED TO 2010 EXTENSION.—In the case of an individual who, with regard to coverage described in paragraph (10)(B), experiences a qualifying event related to a termination of employment on or after June 1, 2010, and prior to the date of the enactment of this paragraph, rules similar to those in paragraphs (4)(A) and (7)(C) shall apply with respect to all continuation coverage, including State continuation coverage programs.”.

(c) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall take effect as if included in the provisions of section 3001 of division B of the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009.

SEC. 4. Extension of use of 2009 poverty guidelines.

Section 1012 of the Department of Defense Appropriations Act, 2010 (Public Law 111–118), as amended by section 6 of the Continuing Extension Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–157), is amended by striking “May 31, 2010” and inserting “September 30, 2010”.

SEC. 5. Use of stimulus funds to offset spending.

The unobligated balance of each amount appropriated or made available under the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111–5) (other than under title X of division A of such Act) is rescinded pro rata such that the aggregate amount of such rescissions equals $27,000,000,000 in order to offset the net increase in spending resulting from the provisions of, and amendments made by, sections 2 through 4. The Director of the Office of Management and Budget shall report to each congressional committee the amounts so rescinded within the jurisdiction of such committee.

SEC. 6. Determination of budgetary effects.

(a) In general.—The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by reference to the latest statement titled “Budgetary Effects of PAYGO Legislation” for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional Record by the Chairman of the House Budget Committee, provided that such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

(b) Emergency designation for congressional enforcement.—In the House of Representatives, this Act, with the exception of section 5, is designated as an emergency for purposes of pay-as-you-go principles. In the Senate, this Act is designated as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 403(a) of S. Con. Res. 13 (111th Congress), the concurrent resolution on the budget for fiscal year 2010.

(c) Emergency designation for statutory paygo.—This Act, with the exception of section 5, is designated as an emergency requirement pursuant to section 4(g) of the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010 (Public Law 111–139; 2 U.S.C. 933(g)).