Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 07/14/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/19/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/19/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/19/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/20/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 07/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/26/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 07/29/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/29/2010