Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/20/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2010