Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/10/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/14/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/15/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/15/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/24/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/26/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/08/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/21/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/22/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/22/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/24/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 07/28/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/28/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/30/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/30/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/31/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/08/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/08/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/08/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/10/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/14/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/14/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/14/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/15/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/15/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/16/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/16/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/21/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/22/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/22/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/29/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/29/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/01/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 10/06/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 10/06/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/08/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/13/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/13/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/20/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/20/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/20/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/23/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/23/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/23/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/23/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 11/02/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 11/02/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/03/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 11/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 11/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 11/17/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/17/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 11/18/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 11/19/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 12/01/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 12/01/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/02/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 12/03/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/07/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/07/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 12/08/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/08/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 12/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 12/09/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 12/14/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/15/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/12/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/15/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/19/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/21/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/22/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 02/24/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/18/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/20/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/21/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 04/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/19/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/08/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/08/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 06/17/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/21/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/29/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 07/15/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/15/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 07/27/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/28/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/29/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 08/10/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/14/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/20/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 09/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/20/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/29/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/02/2010