Text: H.R.5712 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-286 (11/30/2010)

 
[111th Congress Public Law 286]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]



[[Page 124 STAT. 3056]]

Public Law 111-286
111th Congress

                                 An Act


 
        Entitled The Physician Payment and Therapy Relief Act of 
              2010. <<NOTE: Nov. 30, 2010 -  [H.R. 5712]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: The Physician 
Payment and Therapy Relief Act of 2010. 42 USC 1305 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``The Physician Payment and Therapy 
Relief Act of 2010''.
SEC. 2. PHYSICIAN PAYMENT UPDATE.

    Section 1848(d)(11) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395w-
4(d)(11)) is amended--
            (1) in the heading, by striking ``november'' and inserting 
        ``december'';
            (2) in subparagraph (A), by striking ``November 30'' and 
        inserting ``December 31''; and
            (3) in subparagraph (B)--
                    (A) in the heading, by striking ``remaining portion 
                of 2010'' and inserting ``2011''; and
                    (B) by striking ``the period beginning on December 
                1, 2010, and ending on December 31, 2010, and for''.
SEC. 3. TREATMENT OF MULTIPLE SERVICE PAYMENT POLICIES FOR THERAPY 
                    SERVICES.

    (a) Smaller Payment Discount for Certain Multiple Therapy 
Services.--Section 1848(b) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395w-
4(b)) is amended by adding at the end the following new paragraph:
            ``(7) Adjustment in discount for certain multiple therapy 
        services.--In the case of therapy services furnished on or after 
        January 1, 2011, and for which payment is made under fee 
        schedules established under this section, instead of the 25 
        percent multiple procedure payment reduction specified in the 
        final rule published by the Secretary in the Federal Register on 
        November 29, 2010, the reduction percentage shall be 20 
        percent.''.

    (b) Exemption of Payment Reduction From Budget-neutrality.--Section 
1848(c)(2)(B)(v) of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. 1395w-
4(c)(2)(B)(v)) is amended by adding at the end the following new 
subclause:
                                    ``(VII) Reduced expenditures for 
                                multiple therapy services.--Effective 
                                for <<NOTE: Effective date.>>  fee 
                                schedules

[[Page 124 STAT. 3057]]

                                established beginning with 2011, reduced 
                                expenditures attributable to the 
                                multiple procedure payment reduction for 
                                therapy services (as described in 
                                subsection (b)(7)).''.
SEC. 4. DETERMINATION OF BUDGETARY EFFECTS.

    The budgetary effects of this Act, for the purpose of complying with 
the Statutory Pay-As-You-Go Act of 2010, shall be determined by 
reference to the latest statement titled ``Budgetary Effects of PAYGO 
Legislation'' for this Act, submitted for printing in the Congressional 
Record by the Chairman of the Senate Budget Committee, provided that 
such statement has been submitted prior to the vote on passage.

    Approved November 30, 2010.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 5712:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 156 (2010):
            July 14, considered and passed House.
            Nov. 18, considered and passed Senate, amended.
            Nov. 29, House concurred in Senate amendments.

                                  <all>