Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/28/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/28/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/26/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/05/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/05/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/10/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/10/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/18/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/18/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/18/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/31/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/31/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/22/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/22/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/27/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/29/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/29/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/06/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/14/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/14/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/18/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/19/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/10/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/11/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/23/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/26/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/06/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/03/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/25/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/15/2010