Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/19/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/22/2010