Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/14/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-300.
12/14/2010 Signed by President.
12/03/2010 Presented to President.
12/02/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8443)
12/01/2010 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report.
11/17/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 574).(text: CR 11/16/2010 H7461)
07/15/2010 Introduced in House