Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/09/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/09/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/13/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/13/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/23/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 02/23/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/25/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/25/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/04/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 03/05/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/11/2009