Text: H.R.5772 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/19/2010)


111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5772

To limit the moratorium on certain permitting and drilling activities issued by the Secretary of the Interior, and for other purposes.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
July 19, 2010

Mr. Olson introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on Natural Resources


A BILL

To limit the moratorium on certain permitting and drilling activities issued by the Secretary of the Interior, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Limitation on moratorium on certain permitting and drilling activities.

(a) In general.—The moratorium set forth in the decision memorandum of the Secretary of the Interior entitled “Decision memorandum regarding the suspension of certain offshore permitting and drilling activities on the Outer Continental Shelf” and dated July 12, 2010, and any suspension of operations issued in connection with the moratorium, shall not apply to an applicant for a permit to drill if the Secretary determines that the applicant—

(1) has complied with the notice entitled “National Notice to Lessees and Operators of Federal Oil and Gas Leases, Outer Continental Shelf (OCS)” dated June 8, 2010 (NTL No. 2010–N05) and the notice entitled “National Notice to Lessees and Operators of Federal Oil and Gas Leases, Outer Continental Shelf (OCS)” dated June 18, 2010 (NTL No. 2010–N06); and

(2) has completed all required safety inspections.

(b) Determination on permit.—Not later than 30 days after the date on which the Secretary makes a determination that an applicant has complied with paragraphs (1) and (2) of subsection (a), the Secretary shall make a determination on whether to issue the permit.