Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/14/2010 Became Public Law No: 111-301.
12/14/2010 Signed by President.
12/03/2010 Presented to President.
12/01/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8355)
11/30/2010 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Boxer without amendment. Without written report.
09/15/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6718)
09/14/2010 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 111-592.
07/19/2010 Introduced in House