Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/20/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/20/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 07/20/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 07/21/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/21/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/26/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/22/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2010