Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/23/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/17/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/30/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/30/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/30/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/30/2010