Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/21/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/26/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/26/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/26/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/26/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/22/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2010