Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 07/22/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/22/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/29/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/29/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/15/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew