Text: H.R.5827 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (08/12/2010)

Calendar No. 552

111th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 5827

To amend title 11 of the United States Code to include firearms in the types of property allowable under the alternative provision for exempting property from the estate.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES
July 29, 2010

Received

August 5, 2010

Read the first time

August 12, 2010

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To amend title 11 of the United States Code to include firearms in the types of property allowable under the alternative provision for exempting property from the estate.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Protecting Gun Owners in Bankruptcy Act of 2010”.

SEC. 2. Exemptions.

Section 522 of title 11, the United States Code, is amended—

(1) in subsection (d) by adding at the end the following:

“(13) The debtor's aggregate interest, not to exceed $3,000 in value, in a single rifle, shotgun, or pistol, or any combination thereof.”, and

(2) in subsection (f)(4)(A)—

(A) in clause (xiv) by striking “and” at the end,

(B) in clause (xv) by striking the period at the end and inserting “; and”, and

(C) by adding at the end the following:

“(xvi) The debtor's aggregate interest, not to exceed $3,000 in value, in a single rifle, shotgun, or pistol, or any combination thereof.”.

SEC. 3. Effective date; application of amendments.

(a) Effective date.—Except as provided in subsection (b), this Act and the amendments made by this Act shall take effect on the date of the enactment of this Act.

(b) Application of amendments.—The amendments made by this Act shall apply only with respect to cases commenced under title 11 of the United States Code on or after the date of the enactment of this Act.

Passed the House of Representatives July 28, 2010.

Attest:
Lorraine C. Miller,

Clerk.  


Calendar No. 552

111th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 5827

AN ACT
To amend title 11 of the United States Code to include firearms in the types of property allowable under the alternative provision for exempting property from the estate.

August 12, 2010
Read the second time and placed on the calendar