There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

World War II Merchant Mariner Service Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Defense to accept additional documentation when considering the application for veterans status of an individual who performed service in the merchant marines during World War II, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/22/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
09/16/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
07/22/2010Referred to House Armed Services
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Referred to House Veterans' Affairs
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/22/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs07/22/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services07/22/2010 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Military Personnel09/16/2010 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.5829.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5829. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/22/2010)

World War II Merchant Mariner Service Act - Directs the Secretary of Defense (DOD) to consider certain methods for verifying that an individual performed honorable service as a member of the merchant marine during the period beginning on December 7, 1941, and ending on December 31, 1946, for purposes of eligibility for veterans' benefits under the GI Bill Improvement Act of 1977. Requires such methods to include Social Security Administration (SSA) records and validated testimony in the case of the absence of Coast Guard shipping or discharge forms, ship logbooks, or other official employment records.

Requires the Secretary to recognize masters of seagoing vessels or other command officers who were authorized to document an individual for purposes of hiring for the merchant marine or discharge therefrom, when determining whether to recognize service allegedly performed during such period.