Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/14/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/23/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/29/2010