Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 07/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/15/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/29/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/16/2010