Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/26/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 07/28/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/28/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/28/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/28/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/28/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 08/10/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/28/2010