There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Emergency Border Security Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2010

Short Titles as Introduced

Emergency Border Security Supplemental Appropriations Act, 2010

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Making emergency supplemental appropriations for border security for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2010, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/05/2010Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
07/28/2010Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6253)
07/27/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/23/2010SenateMessage received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
09/23/2010-4:23pmHouseSenate amendment and accompanying papers returned to Senate pursuant to H.Res. 1653.
08/06/2010SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/05/2010SenateSee also S. 3721.
08/05/2010SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2010SenateS.Amdt.4593 Amendment SA 4593 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
08/05/2010SenateS.Amdt.4593 Amendment SA 4593 proposed by Senator Schumer. (consideration: CR S6843; text: CR S6843) In the nature of a substitute.
08/05/2010SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6838-6845)
07/29/2010SenateReceived in the Senate.
07/28/2010-8:43pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/28/2010-8:43pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6253)
07/28/2010-8:05pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 5875.
07/28/2010-8:05pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6253-6257)
07/28/2010-8:05pmHouseMr. Price (NC) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/27/2010HouseReferred to House Budget
07/27/2010HouseReferred to House Appropriations
07/27/2010HouseReferred to the Committee on Appropriations, and in addition to the Committee on the Budget, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
07/27/2010HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (12)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Appropriations07/27/2010 Referred to
House Budget07/27/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.5875. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (08/05/2010)

Title I: Department of Homeland Security - Appropriates additional FY2010 amounts to remain available until September 30, 2011, to: (1) U.S. Customs and Border Protection for salaries and expenses related to staffing on the Southwest Border of the United States, construction of up to two Border Patrol forward operating bases along the Southwest Border, and border security fencing, infrastructure, and technology along the Southwest border; (2) U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for salaries and expenses for law enforcement activities along the Southwest Border; and (3) Federal Law Enforcement Training Center training for new U.S. Customs and Border Protection officers and Border Patrol agents.

Appropriates additional FY2010 amounts to remain available until September 30, 2012, for acquisition and deployment of unmanned aircraft systems.

(Sec. 101) Rescinds from unobligated balances certain funds for U.S. Customs and Border Protection, border security fencing, infrastructure, and technology.

Title II: Department of Justice - Appropriates additional FY2010 amounts to remain available until September 30, 2011, for Department of Justice (DOJ) law enforcement activities related to the Southwest Border.

Title III: the Judiciary - Appropriates additional FY2010 amounts to remain available until September 30, 2011, for courts of appeals, district courts, and other judicial services.

States that funding shall be available for transfer between Judiciary accounts to meet increased workload requirements resulting from immigration and other law enforcement initiatives.

Title IV: General Provisions - (Sec. 401) Designates each amount made available under this Act as an emergency requirement and necessary to meet emergency needs.

(Sec. 402) Increases, for the period beginning on the date of the enactment of this Act and ending on September 30, 2014: (1) the L visa (intracompany transfer) nonimmigrant application filing fee and fraud prevention and detection fee by $2,250 for applicants that employ 50 or more employees in the United States if more than 50% of the applicant's employees are L visa or H-1b visa (nonagricultural specialty worker) nonimmigrants; and (2) the H-1b visa application filing fee and fraud prevention and detection fee by $2,000 for applicants that employ 50 or more employees in the United States if more than 50% of the applicant's employees are H-1b or L visa nonimmigrants.

Provides that during such period all amounts collected pursuant to such fee increases shall be deposited in the General Fund of the Treasury.