Refine your search

7 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
01/04/2011 Became Public Law No: 111-365.
01/04/2011 Signed by President.
12/28/2010 Presented to President.
12/16/2010 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10365-10366; text as passed Senate: CR S10366)
12/16/2010 Senate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/29/2010 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 366 - 0 (Roll no. 581).(text: CR H7621)
07/27/2010 Introduced in House