There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Direct Care Workforce Empowerment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Fair Labor Standards Act with regard to certain exemptions under that Act for direct care workers and to improve the systems for the collection and reporting of data relating to the direct care workforce, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/28/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
10/13/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
07/28/2010Referred to House Energy and Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2010Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2010Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2010Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1458)
Action By: House of Representatives
07/28/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (35)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 07/28/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 07/28/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/23/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/23/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/29/2010

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/28/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Workforce Protections10/13/2010 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce07/28/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.5902. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/28/2010)

Direct Care Workforce Empowerment Act - Amends the Fair Labor Standards Act of 1938 to exempt from minimum wage and maximum hour requirements any employee employed on a casual basis in domestic service employment to provide companionship services for individuals who because of disability (or because of age or infirmity, as under current law) are unable to care for themselves.

Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to establish: (1) a direct care workforce monitoring program; and (2) a National Advisory Council on the Direct Care Workforce.

Directs the Secretary to award three-year grants to states and other eligible entities to improve the recruitment, retention, and education of the direct care workforce.