Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 07/29/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/29/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 07/30/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2010