Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/15/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/15/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/22/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 01/22/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/04/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/23/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 03/06/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/01/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 04/22/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/30/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/31/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 10/29/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/19/2009