Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/23/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 11/15/2010