Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 09/22/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/23/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/08/2010