Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 09/23/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/23/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/23/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/16/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/02/2010