Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/30/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/30/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/30/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/30/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/10/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/16/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/22/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 09/23/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/23/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/28/2010
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/28/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 11/17/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/17/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/17/2010