Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 07/29/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/23/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/29/2010