Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 09/14/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/18/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2010