Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/16/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/29/2010