There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the GAO to evaluate the propriety of assistance provided to General Motors Corporation under the Troubled Asset Relief Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/2010Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date
10/13/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Action By: Committee on Education and Labor
09/20/2010Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/30/2010Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Referred to House Financial Services
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Referred to House Education and Labor
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, the Judiciary, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/2010Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and Labor07/30/2010 Referred to
House Education and Labor Subcommittee on Workforce Protections10/13/2010 Referred to
House Financial Services07/30/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary07/30/2010 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law09/20/2010 Referred to
House Oversight and Government Reform07/30/2010 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.6046. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/2010)

Directs the Presidential Task Force on the Auto Industry to submit to the Government Accountability Office (GAO) all information in its possession relating to certain specific communications involving General Motors Corporation (GM) relating to the Task Force's role in negotiating, reviewing, approving, or any other aspect of: (1) the plans for reorganization or restructuring GM in connection with bankruptcy proceedings that commenced during 2009; (2) levels of and reductions in the employee and retiree benefits of current and former GM salaried employees, union employees, and non-union hourly employees and the retiree benefits for former employees of the Delphi Corporation; (3) GM's determination not to alter any preexisting pension obligations during bankruptcy proceedings; (4) GM's determination to expand pension benefits for former unionized Delphi employees that did not have a preexisting pension agreement with GM; and (5) actual payments made by the United States to GM.

Requires: (1) the National Archives and Records Administration (NARA) to submit to GAO all information in its possession related to certain specific communications that occurred between October 3, 2008, and January 20, 2010, related to the role of the Department of the Treasury in negotiating, reviewing, approving, determining, or in any other aspect relating to GM qualifying for federal financial assistance under the Troubled Asset Relief Program (TARP); and (2) the Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation (PBGC) to submit to GAO all information in its possession related to certain communications that occurred in 2009 relating to PBGC's role in negotiating, reviewing, approving, determining, or in any other aspect related to the decision to remove liens on Delphi's overseas assets.

Directs GAO to audit such communications, report its findings to Congress within one year, and include among audit considerations: (1) any decision made during GM's bankruptcy proceedings that appears to be quid pro quo and unduly influenced by the receipt of TARP funds or that would be unlikely to be made by a similar for-profit business that is not receiving TARP assistance; (2) any action that any federal official took to persuade or force GM to take any particular action; and (3) whether the PBGC decision to remove liens on Delphi's overseas assets was in the best interest of U.S. taxpayers.