Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 08/09/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/14/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/14/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/28/2010