Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/16/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/16/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/21/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/27/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/27/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/27/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/28/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/28/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/28/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/04/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/04/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/10/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 02/23/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/24/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/24/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/10/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/30/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/21/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/19/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/25/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/10/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/13/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 10/28/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/28/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/15/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/16/2010