Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/16/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/16/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/16/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 12/14/2010